WA HB1026 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Housing.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - Referred to Housing.
Pending: House Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning local government design review.
Title
Concerning local government design review.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-19 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | Referred to Housing. |
2024-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-03-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2023-01-24 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-01-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-01-19 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-01-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-16 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2022-12-12 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 70b | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70b | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |