WA HB1076 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Effective date 8/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Passed on April 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-13 - Effective date 8/1/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing crime victims to submit input to the department of corrections regarding an offender's placement in work release.
Title
Allowing crime victims to submit input to the department of corrections regarding an offender's placement in work release.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] |
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Sen. Kirk Pearson [R] | Sen. Christine Rolfes [D] | Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] |
Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-04-02 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-13 | Effective date 8/1/2009. | |
2009-04-13 | Chapter 69, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-13 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-07 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-07 | President signed. | |
2009-04-03 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-02 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-02 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-26 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-18 | HSC - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-17 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 8:30 AM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-19 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-28 | HS - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-28 | HS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-28 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-19 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Human Services. | |
2009-01-07 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5438 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.