WA HB1093 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-08 - Referred to Judiciary.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying legal financial obligation provisions.
Title
Clarifying legal financial obligation provisions.
Sponsors
Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Rep. Laurie Dolan [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] | Rep. Strom Peterson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | House | Referred to Judiciary. |
2018-01-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-01-30 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-01-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1093&year=2017 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2017-18/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1093.pdf |