WA HB1148 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date 5/16/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Effective date 5/16/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state general obligation bonds and related accounts.
Title
Concerning state general obligation bonds and related accounts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-22 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-21 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-03-30 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Effective date 5/16/2023. |
2023-05-16 | House | Chapter 473, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-16 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-23 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-22 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2023-04-22 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Read first time, rules suspended, and placed on second reading calendar. |
2023-04-21 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-21 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-21 | House | Floor amendment |
2023-04-21 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2023-04-21 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-03-30 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-03-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 9:00 AM. |
2023-01-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
2023-01-05 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5201 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 527 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 527 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 100a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 100a | 306 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 99u | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 99v | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |