WA HB1245 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing background check provisions for gun sales and transfers relating to Initiative Measure No. 594.
Title
Repealing background check provisions for gun sales and transfers relating to Initiative Measure No. 594.
Sponsors
Rep. Matt Shea [R] | Rep. David Taylor [R] | Rep. Graham Hunt [R] | Rep. Elizabeth Scott [R] |
Rep. Daniel Griffey [R] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Sen. Drew MacEwen [R] | Rep. Jesse Young [R] |
Rep. Larry Haler [R] | Sen. Shelly Short [R] | Rep. Vincent Buys [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1245&year=2015 |
Text | http://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2015-16/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1245.pdf |