WA HB1264 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-24 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regarding the creation and registration of entities formed by public agencies.
Title
Regarding the creation and registration of entities formed by public agencies.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-24 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-04-24 | Chapter 202, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-24 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-16 | President signed. | |
2009-04-15 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-14 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 2; excused, 3. | |
2009-04-14 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-13 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-04-09 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-20 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-18 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-02-25 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-02-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-09 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-28 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-16 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |