WA HB1316 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding access to dual credit programs.
Title
Expanding access to dual credit programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-17 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 82 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-12 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-04 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - House - House Committee on Education: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Chapter 350, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-17 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 82; nays, 14; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-04-17 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Committee amendment |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2023-03-31 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 12:45 PM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-22 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 60; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2023-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-03-04 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2023-02-28 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2023-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-23 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-23 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2023-02-20 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-10 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2023-02-07 | House | ED - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2023-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 4:00 PM. |
2023-02-02 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Education at 8:00 AM. |
2023-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-13 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28a | 320 | 196 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28a | 600 | 287 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 290 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 310 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 390 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28a | 600 | 400 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 76 | 730 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
28b | 77 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 131 | 427 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 131 | 428 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |