WA HB1370 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-26 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning grants for early learning facilities.
Title
Concerning grants for early learning facilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 90 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-17 - House - House Committee on Capital Budget: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-26 | House | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-04-26 | House | Chapter 130, 2021 Laws. |
2021-04-26 | House | Governor signed. |
2021-04-20 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-15 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-12 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 3; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2021-03-10 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-03-08 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 90; nays, 7; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-03-08 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-03-08 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-03-08 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-03-01 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-02-19 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-02 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 1:30 PM. |
2021-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 185 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 31 | 565 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 31 | 577 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |