WA HB1421 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 14 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-14 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting the state's interest in collecting deferred property taxes.
Title
Protecting the state's interest in collecting deferred property taxes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-14 | House | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-05-14 | House | Chapter 221, 2013 Laws. |
2013-05-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2013-04-27 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-27 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-26 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-25 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass. |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2013-04-18 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-18 | House | Floor amendment |
2013-04-18 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-03-13 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2013-03-01 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-25 | House | FIN - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-25 | House | FIN - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-02-25 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2013-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5442 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.