WA HB1434 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Protecting patients in facilities regulated by the department of health by establishing uniform enforcement tools.
Title
Protecting patients in facilities regulated by the department of health by establishing uniform enforcement tools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-08 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2023-01-18 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5271 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-15 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
18 | 46 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 46 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 46 | 050 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 46 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
18 | 64 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | 165 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | 200 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64 | 390 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64a | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
18 | 64a | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 38 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 41 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 43 | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 43 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 45 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 45 | 080 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 302 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 305 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 310 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 127 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 127 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 127 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 127 | 213 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 170 | 020 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 230 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 230 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 230 | 070 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 38 | 025 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 38 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 38 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 42 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | 42 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 42 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 42 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 12 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
71 | 12 | 455 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 12 | 500 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 12 | 710 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
71 | 24 | 025 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
71 | 24 | 037 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1434&Year=2023&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2023-24/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1434.pdf |