WA HB1458 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-1)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Title
Concerning the age of individuals at which sale or distribution of tobacco and vapor products may be made.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-01-28 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-15 | House | Returned to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-04-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-04-03 | House | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-04-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2015-03-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-19 | House | Referred to Finance. |
2015-02-17 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-17 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-02-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 1:30 PM. |
2015-01-21 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |
Same As/Similar To
SB5494 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.