WA HB1527 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-18 - Governor vetoed.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning medicaid payment rates for boarding homes.
Title
Concerning medicaid payment rates for boarding homes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-18 | Governor vetoed. | |
2009-04-26 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-26 | President signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-25 | Passed final passage; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2009-04-25 | Senate receded from amendments. | |
2009-04-23 | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. | |
2009-04-17 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 4. | |
2009-04-17 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-17 | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-24 | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-23 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-05 | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. | |
2009-03-03 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-03 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-26 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-19 | HCW - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-02-19 | HCW - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-19 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-22 | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |