WA HB1532 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning budget submissions for capital design and construction at institutions of higher education.
Title
Concerning budget submissions for capital design and construction at institutions of higher education.
Sponsors
Rep. Norma Smith [R] | Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Richard DeBolt [R] | Rep. Marcus Riccelli [D] |
Rep. Gael Tarleton [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-04 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-02 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-28 | House | Placed on third reading by Rules Committee. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2015-03-04 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 98; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-03-04 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-03 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-12 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-10 | House | CB - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-10 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2015-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-22 | House | First reading, referred to Capital Budget |
Same As/Similar To
SB5562 (Crossfiled) 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.