WA HB1532 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-08 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the exemption of property taxes for nonprofit homeownership development.
Title
Concerning the exemption of property taxes for nonprofit homeownership development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-02-01 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 89 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-02-26 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2018-02-26 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | HSC - Majority; without recommendation. |
2018-02-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 1:30 PM. |
2018-02-05 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 89; nays, 5; absent, 0; excused, 4. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2018-02-01 | Senate | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2018-01-26 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | FIN - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Referred to Finance. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2018-01-08 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-06-21 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-05-23 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2017-04-23 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-03-30 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | HSMH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services, Mental Health & Housing at 1:30 PM. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services, Mental Health & Housing. |
2017-03-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 79; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-03-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-07 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-06 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2017-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-14 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-14 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-23 | House | First reading, referred to Finance |
Same As/Similar To
SB5143 (Crossfiled) 2018-03-15 - Effective date 6/7/2018.