WA HB1536 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-09 - Effective date 7/23/2023.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying requirements governing the withholding of high school diplomas.
Title
Clarifying requirements governing the withholding of high school diplomas.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-11 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House Committee on Education: do pass (Y: 10 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-09 | House | Effective date 7/23/2023. |
2023-05-09 | House | Chapter 384, 2023 Laws. |
2023-05-09 | House | Governor signed. |
2023-04-19 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | President signed. |
2023-04-14 | House | Speaker signed. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 28; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2023-03-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-03-01 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2023-02-27 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 74; nays, 21; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2023-02-27 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2023-02-22 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2023-02-15 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2023-02-13 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2023-02-13 | House | ED - Majority; do pass. |
2023-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-02-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Education at 1:30 PM. |
2023-01-24 | House | First reading, referred to Education. |