WA HB1615 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-14 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning relocation assistance for persons displaced by agency property acquisitions.
Title
Concerning relocation assistance for persons displaced by agency property acquisitions.
Sponsors
Rep. Shelley Kloba [D] | Rep. Judith Clibborn [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 91 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-14 | House | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-14 | House | Chapter 12, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-14 | House | Governor signed. |
2017-04-10 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-06 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2017-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 91; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-14 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-13 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-02-09 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-02-09 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. |
2017-01-31 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-25 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB5365 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.