WA HB1621 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-20 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Regulating the business practices of consumer loan companies for compliance with the secure and fair enforcement for mortgage licensing act of 2008.
Title
Regulating the business practices of consumer loan companies for compliance with the secure and fair enforcement for mortgage licensing act of 2008.
Sponsors
Sen. Barbara Bailey [R] | Rep. Steve Kirby [D] | Rep. Jim Moeller [D] | Sen. Sharon Nelson [D] |
Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. Geoffrey Simpson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-20 | Effective date 7/26/2009*. | |
2009-04-20 | Chapter 120, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-04-17 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-13 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-10 | President signed. | |
2009-04-09 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-08 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 41; nays, 3; absent, 3; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-08 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-04-02 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-03-31 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-25 | FIHI - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-24 | Public hearing, executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Financial Institutions, and Housing & Insurance at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-03-11 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions, Housing & Insurance. | |
2009-03-09 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-09 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-09 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-06 | Placed on second reading. | |
2009-03-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-25 | APPG - Majority; do pass FII 09 bill proposed by Financial Institutions & Insurance. | |
2009-02-25 | APPG - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-25 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government Appropriations at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-17 | Referred to General Government Appropriations. | |
2009-02-12 | FII - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-12 | FII - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-03 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Financial Institutions & Insurance at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-01-26 | First reading, referred to Financial Institutions & Insurance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5759 (Crossfiled) 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.