WA HB1621 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Early Learning & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Making technical corrections to department of early learning statutes.
Title
Making technical corrections to department of early learning statutes.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-28 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Early Learning & Human Services. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-28 | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. | |
2011-03-25 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-03-24 | EDU - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-03-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-03-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-03-02 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. | |
2011-02-28 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-02-28 | Placed on third reading. | |
2011-02-28 | Committee recommendations adopted and the 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2011-02-25 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar by Rules Committee. | |
2011-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-15 | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-15 | ELHS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-10 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-27 | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services. |