WA HB1671 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 21-2)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Enacting the regulatory fairness act of 2011.
Title
Enacting the regulatory fairness act of 2011.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-14 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on State Government & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-01-28 | First reading, referred to State Government & Tribal Affairs. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=1671&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/House Bills/1671.pdf |