WA HB1671 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 8 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-08 - Effective date 7/24/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing access to opioid antagonists to prevent opioid-related overdose deaths.
Title
Increasing access to opioid antagonists to prevent opioid-related overdose deaths.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-04-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage as Amended by the Senate (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-08 | House | Effective date 7/24/2015. |
2015-05-08 | House | Chapter 205, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-08 | House | Governor signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-24 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-23 | House | Passed final passage; yeas, 97; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-23 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Rules suspended. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate receded from amendments. |
2015-04-16 | House | House refuses to concur in Senate amendments. Asks Senate to recede from amendments. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Committee amendment adopted with no other amendments. |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | HLTH - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Health Care at 10:00 AM. |
2015-03-04 | Senate | First reading, referred to Health Care. |
2015-03-02 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 96; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-02 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-03-02 | House | Floor amendment |
2015-03-02 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2015-02-27 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-17 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-02-13 | House | HCW - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2015-02-13 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 10:00 AM. |
2015-02-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Health Care & Wellness at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-26 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness |