WA HB1671 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness.
Pending: House Health Care and Wellness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a prescription drug affordability board.
Title
Establishing a prescription drug affordability board.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Health Care & Wellness. |
2021-12-20 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5532 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-24 - Effective date 6/9/2022.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 71 | 130 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 71c | 100 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
48 | 43 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
70 | New Code | See Bill Text |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://app.leg.wa.gov/billsummary?BillNumber=1671&Year=2021&Initiative=false |
Text | https://lawfilesext.leg.wa.gov/biennium/2021-22/Pdf/Bills/House%20Bills/1671.pdf |