WA HB1805 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Business & Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing the criminal penalty for making unlicensed small loans.
Title
Increasing the criminal penalty for making unlicensed small loans.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] | Rep. Sharon Santos [D] |
Sen. Derek Stanford [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-05 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-22 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2011-03-15 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2011-03-08 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2011-03-05 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 56; nays, 41; absent, 0; excused, 1. | |
2011-03-05 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-16 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-15 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-15 | BFS - Majority; do pass. | |
2011-02-15 | BFS - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Business & Financial Services at 1:30 PM. | |
2011-02-11 | Referred to Business & Financial Services. | |
2011-02-11 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-02-02 | First reading, referred to Public Safety & Emergency Preparedness. |