WA HB1805 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing rental assistance to mobile home park tenants.
Title
Providing rental assistance to mobile home park tenants.
Sponsors
Rep. Ed Orcutt [R] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-15 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-15 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-13 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 9:00 AM. |
2019-02-12 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-08 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing, Community Development & Veterans at 10:00 AM. |
2019-01-31 | House | First reading, referred to Housing, Community Development & Veterans. |