WA HB1887 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2009 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning diking districts.
Title
Concerning diking districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dean Takko [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-04-26 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2009-03-30 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-30 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-03-26 | Public hearing and executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-03-13 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-03-11 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. | |
2009-03-11 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-03-11 | Floor amendment | |
2009-03-11 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-20 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-16 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-16 | LGH - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2009-02-16 | LGH - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-02-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-02-12 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government & Housing at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-02-02 | First reading, referred to Local Government & Housing. |