WA HB1915 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Capital Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning state assistance for financing local government infrastructure.
Title
Concerning state assistance for financing local government infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Edwin Anderson [R] | Rep. Michael Armstrong [R] | Rep. Cary Condotta [R] | Rep. Hans Dunshee [D] |
Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Timm Ormsby [D] | Rep. Michael Sells [D] | Sen. Judith Warnick [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Capital Budget. | |
2012-01-12 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-03-07 | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. | |
2011-03-03 | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. | |
2011-02-23 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2011-02-21 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-21 | CB - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2011-02-21 | CB - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2011-02-21 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-15 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Capital Budget at 8:00 AM. | |
2011-02-09 | First reading, referred to Capital Budget. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5745 (Crossfiled) 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.