WA HB2022 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-01-13 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning dispensing contraceptive drugs for medicaid enrollees.
Title
Concerning dispensing contraceptive drugs for medicaid enrollees.
Sponsors
Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Dawn Morrell [D] | Rep. Tami Green [D] | Rep. Eileen Cody [D] |
Rep. Ross Hunter [D] | Rep. Cindy Ryu [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Rep. Mary Roberts [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2014-01-13 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. |
2014-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-11-07 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-09 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-04-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-04-05 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-04-05 | House | APP - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-04-05 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2013-04-02 | House | First reading, referred to Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB5884 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.