WA HB2022 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-07 - Referred to Rules 2 Review.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning social equity in the cannabis industry.
Title
Concerning social equity in the cannabis industry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-07 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming (Y: 17 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - House Committee on Commerce & Gaming: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-07 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2022-02-07 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-07 | House | APP - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Commerce & Gaming. |
2022-02-07 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2022-02-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2022-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2022-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | COG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2022-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-28 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Commerce & Gaming at 10:00 AM. |
2022-01-17 | House | First reading, referred to Commerce & Gaming. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 330 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
69 | 50 | 331 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 335 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 345 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 50 | 540 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |