WA HB2034 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Effective date 6/6/2024.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring counties and cities to provide the administrative office of the courts with notice of court reorganizations.
Title
Requiring counties and cities to provide the administrative office of the courts with notice of court reorganizations.
Sponsors
Rep. Greg Cheney [R] | Rep. Jamila Taylor [D] | Rep. Mari Leavitt [D] | Rep. Bill Ramos [D] |
Rep. Julia Reed [D] | Rep. Kristine Reeves [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-28 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Law & Justice: do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-01-12 - House - House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary: do pass (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Effective date 6/6/2024. |
2024-03-13 | House | Chapter 61, 2024 Laws. |
2024-03-13 | House | Governor signed. |
2024-03-01 | House | Delivered to Governor. |
2024-02-29 | Senate | President signed. |
2024-02-29 | House | Speaker signed. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2024-02-28 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-01-16 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-01-12 | House | CRJ - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-09 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Civil Rights & Judiciary at 10:30 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Civil Rights & Judiciary. |
2023-12-22 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5833 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-08 - First reading, referred to Law & Justice.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 50 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 50 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 50 | 805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3 | 50 | 810 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
35 | 20 | 010 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
39 | 34 | 180 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |