WA HB2114 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Improving housing stability for tenants subject to the residential landlord-tenant act and the manufactured/mobile home landlord-tenant act by limiting rent and fee increases, requiring notice of rent and fee increases, limiting fees and deposits, establishing a landlord resource center and associated services, authorizing tenant lease termination, creating parity between lease types, and providing for attorney general enforcement.
Title
Improving housing stability for tenants subject to the residential landlord-tenant act and the manufactured/mobile home landlord-tenant act by limiting rent and fee increases, requiring notice of rent and fee increases, limiting fees and deposits, establishing a landlord resource center and associated services, authorizing tenant lease termination, creating parity between lease types, and providing for attorney general enforcement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-13 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 54 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-03 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-16 - House - House Committee on Housing: do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-13 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 54; nays, 43; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-13 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-13 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-13 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-03 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | APP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-03 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-24 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-19 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-16 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-16 | House | HOUS - Majority; do pass. |
2024-01-16 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-11 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 8:00 AM. |
2024-01-08 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-01-03 | House | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5961 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-26 - Executive session, but the motion to report the bill out of the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM failed.
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 18 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 18 | 140 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 200 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 270 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 18 | 650 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
59 | 20 | 030 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 060 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 090 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 20 | 170 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |