WA HB2117 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-21 - House Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Providing a pathway to modernize and rebalance the Washington state tax structure so that it is equitable, adequate, stable, and transparent for the people of Washington state.
Title
Providing a pathway to modernize and rebalance the Washington state tax structure so that it is equitable, adequate, stable, and transparent for the people of Washington state.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-21 | House | House Rules "X" file. |
2020-01-13 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-21 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2019-03-11 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2019-03-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2019-02-28 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-28 | House | Public hearing and executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:00 AM. |
2019-02-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2019-02-27 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | FIN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-27 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-26 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Finance at 8:00 AM. |
2019-02-22 | House | First reading, referred to Finance. |
Same As/Similar To
SB5973 (Crossfiled) 2020-01-13 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.