WA HB2148 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the state auditor including allowing for audits to be conducted by a private entity and establishing an appeal process.
Title
Concerning the state auditor including allowing for audits to be conducted by a private entity and establishing an appeal process.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-16 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Accountability & Reform at 8:00 AM. |
2016-02-18 | Senate | First reading, referred to Accountability & Reform. |
2016-02-16 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2016-02-16 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2016-02-16 | House | Floor amendment |
2016-02-16 | House | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2016-02-15 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2016-02-09 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2016-02-08 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2016-02-08 | House | GGIT - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2016-02-08 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2016-01-11 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | House | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-02-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on General Government & Information Technology at 9:00 AM. |
2015-02-18 | House | First reading, referred to General Government & Information Technology |