WA HB2196 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 23 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Adopting the uniform collaborative law act.
Title
Adopting the uniform collaborative law act.
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Eddy [D] | Rep. Roger Goodman [D] | Rep. Laurie Jinkins [D] | Rep. Troy Kelley [D] |
Rep. Terry Nealey [R] | Sen. Jamie Pedersen [D] | Rep. Jay Rodne [R] | Rep. David Upthegrove [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-01-23 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-03-08 | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. | |
2012-03-08 | Referred to Rules. | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-02-24 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2012-02-24 | Minority; without recommendation. | |
2012-02-24 | JUD - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2012-02-24 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 12:00 PM. | |
2012-02-17 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-01-24 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-01-23 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 95; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. | |
2012-01-23 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2012-01-23 | 1st substitute bill substituted | |
2012-01-20 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2012-01-16 | Referred to Rules 2 Review. | |
2012-01-12 | JUDI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. | |
2012-01-12 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2012-01-12 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2012-01-09 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2012-01-09 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2012-12-15 | Prefiled for introduction. |