WA HB2270 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 49-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creating a Washington state department of housing.
Title
Creating a Washington state department of housing.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-16 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 19 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-30 - House - House Committee on Housing: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-22 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-16 | Senate | HSG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-16 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 58; nays, 39; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-30 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | HOUS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-30 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Housing at 4:00 PM. |
2024-01-10 | House | First reading, referred to Housing. |