WA HB2401 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-03-07 - By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading.
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for the responsible management of refrigerant gases with a higher global warming potential than carbon dioxide that are used in appliances or other infrastructure.
Title
Providing for the responsible management of refrigerant gases with a higher global warming potential than carbon dioxide that are used in appliances or other infrastructure.
Sponsors
Rep. Davina Duerr [D] | Rep. Beth Doglio [D] | Rep. Liz Berry [D] | Rep. Joe Fitzgibbon [D] |
Rep. Alex Ramel [D] | Rep. Gerry Pollet [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-02-20 - Senate - Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-09 - House - House 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-02-05 - House - House Committee on Appropriations: 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-29 - House - House Committee on Environment & Energy: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-07 | House | By resolution, returned to House Rules Committee for third reading. |
2024-02-26 | Senate | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 10:00 AM. |
2024-02-24 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 9:00 AM. |
2024-02-21 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2024-02-20 | Senate | ENET - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2024-02-20 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2024-02-14 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Environment, Energy & Technology at 8:00 AM. |
2024-02-13 | Senate | First reading, referred to Environment, Energy & Technology. |
2024-02-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2024-02-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2024-02-09 | House | Floor amendment |
2024-02-09 | House | 2nd substitute bill substituted |
2024-02-08 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2024-02-05 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-02-05 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | APP - Majority; 2nd substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-02-05 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Appropriations at 10:30 AM. |
2024-02-03 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Appropriations at 9:00 AM. |
2024-01-31 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2024-01-29 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2024-01-29 | House | ENVI - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2024-01-29 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-22 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment & Energy at 1:30 PM. |
2024-01-16 | House | First reading, referred to Environment & Energy. |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
43 | 21b | 110 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
43 | 21b | 300 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
70a | New Code | See Bill Text | ||
70a | 65 | 260 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
82 | 04 | New Code | See Bill Text |