WA HB2450 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-29 - Referred to Appropriations.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the business of child care.
Title
Supporting the business of child care.
Sponsors
Rep. Tana Senn [D] | Rep. Mark Hargrove [R] | Rep. Mike Chapman [D] | Rep. Christine Kilduff [D] |
Rep. Richard Muri [R] | Rep. Ruth Kagi [D] | Rep. Sherry Appleton [D] | Rep. Steve Tharinger [D] |
Rep. Beth Doglio [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations. |
2018-01-24 | House | ELHS - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2018-01-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-23 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 8:00 AM. |
2018-01-19 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 10:00 AM. |
2018-01-17 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Early Learning & Human Services at 1:30 PM. |
2018-01-09 | House | First reading, referred to Early Learning & Human Services |