WA SB5002 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing acquisition of federal property by eminent domain.
Title
Authorizing acquisition of federal property by eminent domain.
Sponsors
Sen. Randi Becker [R] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] | Sen. Harry Morton [R] | Sen. Pamela Roach [R] |
Sen. Val Stevens [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-12-07 | Due to Senate committee reorganization, referred to Energy, Natural Resources & Marine Waters. | |
2011-12-07 | Committee relieved of further consideration. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Marine Waters. | |
2011-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5002&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5002.pdf |