WA SB5011 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-12 - Returned to Senate Rules 3.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning a community aviation revitalization loan program.
Title
Concerning a community aviation revitalization loan program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-14 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-12 | House | Returned to Senate Rules 3. |
2020-03-06 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2020-03-05 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2020-03-03 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2020-03-02 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2020-03-02 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2020-02-29 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 11:00 AM. |
2020-02-17 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 47; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 2. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2020-02-14 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Moved to Rules White Sheet. |
2020-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2019-01-14 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
2018-12-07 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |