WA SB5016 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-15 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying when a special election may be held.
Title
Modifying when a special election may be held.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Evans-Parlette [R] | Sen. Darlene Fairley [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Jim Honeyford [R] |
Sen. Derek Kilmer [D] | Sen. Joe McDermott [D] | Sen. Eric Oemig [D] | Sen. Paull Shin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-15 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2010-01-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2009-03-25 | Senate Rules "X" file. | |
2009-02-10 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-02-02 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-02-02 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2009-02-02 | GO - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-29 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-22 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Government Operations & Elections at 3:30 PM. | |
2009-01-12 | First reading, referred to Government Operations & Elections. | |
2009-12-08 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1018 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-08 - Effective date 7/26/2009*.
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5016&year=2009 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2009-10/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5016.pdf |