WA SB5016 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-04-11 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Health & Long-term Care Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting smoking in vehicles containing children.
Title
Prohibiting smoking in vehicles containing children.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-04-04 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2012-01-09 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-11-28 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-04-26 | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. | |
2011-02-03 | Referred to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-02-03 | Minority; do not pass. | |
2011-02-03 | And refer to Health & Long-Term Care. | |
2011-02-03 | TRAN - Majority; without recommendation. | |
2011-02-02 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-26 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. | |
2011-01-10 | First reading, referred to Transportation. | |
2011-12-17 | Prefiled for introduction. |
Washington State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/billinfo/summary.aspx?bill=5016&year=2011 |
Text | http://apps.leg.wa.gov/documents/billdocs/2011-12/Pdf/Bills/Senate Bills/5016.pdf |