WA SB5023 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Pending: Senate Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning working connections child care eligibility and unemployment benefits.
Title
Concerning working connections child care eligibility and unemployment benefits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education: do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | And refer to Ways & Means. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 10:30 AM. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
2020-12-17 | Senate | Prefiled for introduction. |