WA SB5040 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 17 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-17 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Making revisions to the uniform business organizations code.
Title
Making revisions to the uniform business organizations code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-17 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Chapter 31, 2017 Laws. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-10 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-05 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 97; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-05 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-31 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-03-24 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-03-22 | House | JUDI - Majority; do pass. |
2017-03-22 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. |
2017-03-14 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. |
2017-03-03 | House | First reading, referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 1; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | On motion, referred to Rules Green Sheet for second reading. |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | LAW - Majority; do pass. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 8:00 AM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Law & Justice at 10:00 AM. |
2017-01-11 | Senate | First reading, referred to Law & Justice. |