WA SB5153 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-06 - Effective date 7/26/2009.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Creating the uniform foreign-country money judgments recognition act.
Title
Creating the uniform foreign-country money judgments recognition act.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Effective date 7/26/2009. | |
2009-05-06 | Chapter 363, 2009 Laws. | |
2009-05-06 | Governor signed. | |
2009-04-23 | Delivered to Governor. | |
2009-04-21 | Speaker signed. | |
2009-04-19 | President signed. | |
2009-04-18 | Passed final passage; yeas, 44; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. | |
2009-04-18 | Senate concurred in House amendments. | |
2009-04-06 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 94; nays, 2; absent, 0; excused, 2. | |
2009-04-06 | Placed on third reading. | |
2009-04-06 | Committee recommendations adopted and the bill amended. | |
2009-03-31 | Placed on second reading suspension calendar. | |
2009-03-18 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-03-16 | JUDI - Majority; do pass with amendment | |
2009-03-16 | JUDI - Executive action taken by committee. | |
2009-03-16 | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-03-11 | Public hearing in the House Committee on Judiciary at 8:00 AM. | |
2009-03-02 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. | |
2009-02-26 | Third reading, passed; yeas, 45; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 4. | |
2009-02-26 | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. | |
2009-02-17 | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. | |
2009-01-29 | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. | |
2009-01-29 | JUD - Majority; do pass. | |
2009-01-27 | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 10:00 AM. | |
2009-01-23 | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Judiciary at 1:30 PM. | |
2009-01-15 | First reading, referred to Judiciary. |