WA SB5235 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Effective date 7/28/2013*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Effective date 7/28/2013*.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the requirements for purchase of care for Indian children.
Title
Modifying the requirements for purchase of care for Indian children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 81 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013*. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Chapter 32, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-22 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-11 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 81; nays, 16; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2013-04-11 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-10 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-04-08 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Consideration. |
2013-03-25 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-19 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-19 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-06 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 8:00 AM. |
2013-02-28 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1361 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-20 - House Rules "X" file.