WA SB5235 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-13 - Effective date 7/25/2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing housing unit inventory by removing arbitrary limits on housing options.
Title
Increasing housing unit inventory by removing arbitrary limits on housing options.
Sponsors
Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Mona Das [D] | Sen. Joe Nguyen [D] | Sen. T'wina Nobles [D] |
Sen. Rebecca Saldana [D] | Sen. Claire Wilson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-19 - House - House Committee on Local Government: do pass with amendment(s) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Effective date 7/25/2021. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 306, 2021 Laws PV. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2021-04-23 | House | Speaker signed. |
2021-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 30; nays, 18; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2021-04-07 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 57; nays, 40; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2021-04-07 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | Floor amendment |
2021-04-07 | House | Committee amendment not adopted. |
2021-03-26 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2021-03-23 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2021-03-19 | House | LG - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2021-03-19 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 8:30 AM. |
2021-03-17 | House | Executive session scheduled, but no action was taken in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-03-10 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Local Government at 10:00 AM. |
2021-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Local Government. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 43; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Floor amendment |
2021-02-24 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-26 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-15 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
35 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
35a | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 70a | 696 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 70a | 698 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |