WA SB5289 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-03 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the discover pass.
Title
Concerning the discover pass.
Sponsors
Sen. James Hargrove [D] | Sen. Brian Hatfield [D] | Sen. Kevin Ranker [D] | Sen. Steven Hobbs [D] |
Sen. Tim Sheldon [D] | Sen. Mark Schoesler [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-08 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-03 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-05-13 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2013-04-28 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2013-04-04 | House | Public hearing in the House Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government & Information Technology at 1:30 PM. |
2013-03-28 | House | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on General Government. |
2013-03-26 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2013-03-26 | House | CDHT - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2013-03-26 | House | CDHT - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-26 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-19 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Community Development and Housing & Tribal Affairs at 10:00 AM. |
2013-03-11 | House | First reading, referred to Community Development, Housing & Tribal Affairs |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 49; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-03-08 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Made eligible to be placed on second reading. |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-15 | Senate | NRP - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Natural Resources & Parks at 1:30 PM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | First reading, referred to Natural Resources & Parks. |