WA SB5289 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-16 - Effective date 7/23/2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the infraction of and penalties for distracted driving.
Title
Modifying the infraction of and penalties for distracted driving.
Sponsors
Sen. Anna Rivers [R] | Sen. Marko Liias [D] | Sen. Mark Miloscia [R] | Sen. Reuven Carlyle [D] |
Sen. Patty Kuderer [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 61 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House Final Passage as Amended by the House (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - Senate 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-16 | Senate | Effective date 7/23/2017. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 334, 2017 Laws PV. |
2017-05-16 | Senate | Governor partially vetoed. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2017-04-20 | House | Speaker signed. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | President signed. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Passed final passage; yeas, 39; nays, 10; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments. |
2017-04-19 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 61; nays, 36; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-19 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-04-19 | House | Returned to second reading for amendment. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rules suspended. |
2017-04-19 | House | House receded from amendments. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate refuses to concur in House amendments. Asks House to recede from amendments. |
2017-04-12 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 63; nays, 35; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-04-12 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-04-12 | House | Committee amendment |
2017-04-12 | House | Floor amendment |
2017-04-07 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-04-04 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-04-04 | House | TR - Majority; do pass with amendment |
2017-04-04 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 2:30 PM. |
2017-03-23 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-03-08 | House | First reading, referred to Transportation |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 36; nays, 13; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | 1st substitute bill substituted |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Minority; without recommendation. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Minority; do not pass. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1371 (Crossfiled) 2018-01-08 - Referred to Transportation.