WA SB5312 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-10 - By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creating flexibility for the educator retooling conditional scholarship program.
Title
Creating flexibility for the educator retooling conditional scholarship program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-24 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2016-01-11 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-06-28 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-05-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-29 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2015-04-24 | House | By resolution, returned to Senate Rules Committee for third reading. |
2015-02-25 | House | First reading, referred to Education |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 1; excused, 2. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Placed on second reading consent calendar. |
2015-02-06 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | EDU - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-05 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Early Learning & K-12 Education at 8:00 AM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Early Learning & K-12 Education. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1570 (Crossfiled) 2015-07-06 - Effective date 10/9/2015.