WA SB5314 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 6/30/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Effective date 6/30/2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying the use of local storm water charges paid by the department of transportation.
Title
Modifying the use of local storm water charges paid by the department of transportation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-03 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | Senate | Effective date 6/30/2015. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Chapter 231, 2015 Laws. |
2015-05-11 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2015-04-23 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2015-04-22 | House | Speaker signed. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | President signed. |
2015-04-15 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 92; nays, 6; absent, 0; excused, 0. |
2015-04-15 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-04-14 | House | Rules Committee relieved of further consideration. Placed on second reading. |
2015-04-01 | House | Referred to Rules 2 Review. |
2015-03-31 | House | TR - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-31 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-30 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Transportation at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-26 | House | Referred to Transportation. |
2015-03-24 | House | Minority; do not pass. |
2015-03-24 | House | ENVI - Majority; do pass. |
2015-03-24 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Environment at 1:30 PM. |
2015-03-12 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Environment at 9:00 AM. |
2015-03-05 | House | First reading, referred to Environment |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 48; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 1. |
2015-03-03 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | TRAN - Majority; do pass. |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Transportation at 3:30 PM. |
2015-01-19 | Senate | First reading, referred to Transportation. |