WA SB5380 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-17 - Senate Rules "X" file.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Concerning the approval of building permits.
Title
Concerning the approval of building permits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-27 - Senate - Senate Committee on Ways & Means: do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing & Local Government (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - Senate - Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government: 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Rules "X" file. |
2022-02-09 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2022-01-28 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | WM - Majority; do pass 1st substitute bill proposed by Housing & Local Government. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-20 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Ways & Means at 4:00 PM. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | By resolution, reintroduced and retained in present status. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | On motion, referred to Ways & Means. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | HLG - Majority; 1st substitute bill be substituted, do pass. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Housing & Local Government at 8:00 AM. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | First reading, referred to Housing & Local Government. |
Subjects
BUILDING CODES AND PERMITS
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENT
GROWTH MANAGEMENT
LAND USE PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
SHORELINES AND SHORELINE MANAGEMENT
SUBDIVISIONS
COMMERCE, DEPARTMENT
ENVIRONMENT
GROWTH MANAGEMENT
LAND USE PLANNING AND DEVELOPMENT
SHORELINES AND SHORELINE MANAGEMENT
SUBDIVISIONS