WA SB5466 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 23 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-23 - Effective date 7/28/2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Modifying criminal history record information compliance audit provisions.
Title
Modifying criminal history record information compliance audit provisions.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-09 - House - House vote on Final Passage (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-25 - Senate - Senate vote on 3rd Reading & Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-23 | Senate | Effective date 7/28/2013. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Chapter 62, 2013 Laws. |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Governor signed. |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Delivered to Governor. |
2013-04-16 | House | Speaker signed. |
2013-04-11 | Senate | President signed. |
2013-04-09 | House | Third reading, passed; yeas, 93; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 5. |
2013-04-09 | House | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-04-08 | House | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-03-14 | House | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-03-12 | House | PS - Majority; do pass. |
2013-03-12 | House | PS - Executive action taken by committee. |
2013-03-12 | House | Executive action taken in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM. |
2013-03-05 | House | Public hearing in the House Committee on Public Safety at 8:30 AM. |
2013-02-26 | House | First reading, referred to Public Safety. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Third reading, passed; yeas, 46; nays, 0; absent, 0; excused, 3. |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Rules suspended. Placed on Third Reading. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Placed on second reading by Rules Committee. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Passed to Rules Committee for second reading. |
2013-02-08 | Senate | HSC - Majority; do pass. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Executive action taken in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Public hearing in the Senate Committee on Human Services & Corrections at 10:00 AM. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | First reading, referred to Human Services & Corrections. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1531 (Crossfiled) 2014-01-13 - Referred to Public Safety.